This case was last updated from La Crosse County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 01:24:08 (UTC).

JLG Properties Rentals LLC vs. Devin Gage

Case Summary

On 07/15/2021 JLG Properties Rentals LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Devin Gage. This case was filed in La Crosse County Courts, La Crosse County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Wickler, Jody R, Doyle, Gloria L and Levine, Elliott M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********1020

  • Filing Date:

    07/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    La Crosse, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Wickler, Jody R

Doyle, Gloria L

Levine, Elliott M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JLG Properties Rentals LLC

Po Box 3695

La Crosse, WI 54602

Defendant

Gage, Devin

Winona, MN 55987

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Levine, Elliott M; Additional Text: without prejudice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Doyle, Gloria L.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: status letter from SC clerk

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Adjourned return date; Court Official: Wickler, Jody R; Additional Text: MAIL RETURNED- NEED SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Pl called and requested an adjourned return date for 9/10/21 @ 9

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 31004 (Small Claims, Eviction) to 31001 (Sm Claim, Claim Under $ Limit).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 010096

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less