This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 01/21/2022 at 11:19:09 (UTC).

Jessica Kilian vs. Kelsey Barton

Case Summary

On 01/04/2021 Jessica Kilian filed a Contract - Business lawsuit against Kelsey Barton. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Day, Craig R. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0004

  • Filing Date:

    01/04/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Business

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Day, Craig R

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Kilian, Jessica

Platteville, WI 53818

Defendant

Barton, Kelsey

Platteville, WI 53818

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Russell, Nathan Roland, Aty

Defendant Attorney

Fisher, Tia G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty Fisher re: dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Day, Craig R

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Arbitrators Decision

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Day, Craig R; Additional Text: to compel arbiration & stay proceedings

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Motion hearing on June 22, 2021 at 08:45 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer to counterclaim; Additional Text: Plf's answer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Motion hearing on March 4, 2021 at 08:45 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of motion, motion; Additional Text: to stay proceedings & compel arbitration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000157, Payable Number: 143167, Receipt Number: 21R 000356, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 000033, Payable Number: 143065, Receipt Number: 21R 000094, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Russell, Nathan Roland, Aty