This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 18:51:17 (UTC).

Jerome M Walczak vs. Proline Heating & A/C

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 Jerome M Walczak filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Proline Heating A/C. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Gorney, Caryn A, Yackel, John M and Turnbull, Lisa M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0037

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Gorney, Caryn A

Yackel, John M

Turnbull, Lisa M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Walczak, Jerome M

Exeland, WI 54835

Defendant

Proline Heating & A/C

Po Box 296, Kyle Kujac

Radisson, WI 54867

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Court trial; Court Official: Gorney, Caryn A; Additional Text: 02:04 PM ON THE RECORD: Plaintiff Jerome Michael Walczak and wife Amy in court. Defendant Proline Heating & A/C (Kyle Kujac) in court. Court swears in all parties. Court questions Plaintiff about home and heating system. Court questions Defendant. Defendant's witness (Carl Kujak) sworn in by Court and testifies direct. Court requests receipt from Ryan Strand for labor and replacement part. Plaintiff offers Exhibit 1 (written statement from Ryan Strand's Plumbing regarding work completed). Court reviews receipt with parties. Court accepts Exhibit 1. Court reviews facts and history of the case. Court questions Plaintiff. Plaintiff provided copy of Estimate to the Court. Court questions defendant about Estimate and the system that was installed. Plaintiff's witness (Michael Lehnert) sworn in by Court and testifies direct. Court gives DEF and PL the opportunity to question witness. No questions. Witness excused. Court questions Plaintiff. Further questions directed to witness Michael Leonard. Defendant makes final argument. Plaintiff makes final argument. Court questions witness Michael Leonard. Court addresses parties. Claim is dismissed without Prejudice. The PL may motion to reopen the case with more evidence.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit; Additional Text: Exhibit 1 - Written statement from Ryan Strand regarding work completed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Exhibit list

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: See other "Notes" event

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Minutes from 6/2/2021 Court Trial

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Judgment after court trial; Court Official: Yackel, John M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Defendant's Answer - No counterclaim

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on June 2, 2021 at 02:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Response/reply; Additional Text: Plaintiff's response to Defendant's request for additional information

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date for Proline Heating & A/C; Court Official: Gorney, Caryn A; Additional Text: 10:00 AM - Plaintiff Jerome M Walczak appeared by phone means. Defendant Proline Heating & A/C did not appear. PL requested judgment, without attorney fees. DEF filed answer to contest. Court trial to be set by JA. Advised PL that he needs to file a response to the DEF's request for more information.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Contested

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request; Additional Text: Defendent's request for additional information from Plaintiff

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Complaint - Smalls Claims; Additional Text: Claim for $10,000

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $94.5; Additional Text: 21R 000751

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certified mail service; Amount: $8.0; Additional Text: 21R 000751 7020 0090 0001 4198 6788

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on March 17, 2021 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less