This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 01:51:35 (UTC).

Jeremiah D. Glammeier et al vs. Michael A. Larson et al

Case Summary

On 05/07/2021 Jeremiah D Glammeier filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against Michael A Larson. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Long, Emily M. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0198

  • Filing Date:

    05/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Long, Emily M

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Glammeier, Jeremiah D.

Menomonie, WI 54751

Defendants

Larson, Michael A.

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Christen, Ryan R.

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Not Yet Classified

Managed Health Services Insurance Corp.

Suite 200, 801 West 60Th Street

West Allis, WI 53214

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heit, Jay E.

Defendant Attorney

Manydeeds, John E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/prop. order of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation/order of dismissal; Court Official: Long, Emily M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Settlement/Stipulation to Dismiss - Before Trial; Court Official: Long, Emily M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Expert witness list - plaintiff; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Notice of Expert Witnesses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Offer of settlement; Additional Text: Plaintiff's Offer of Settlement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Amended answer filed; Additional Text: Defendants Michael Larson & Ryan Christen's Amended Answer and Affirmative Defenses

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: Request by Defendants for 6 Person Jury Trial with Fee Paid

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $36.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 284417, Payable Number: 261193, Receipt Number: 21R 022716, Amount: $36.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Scheduling Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Granting Plaintiff's Motion to Compel as to interrogatories Number 1 and 2 and Denial of Requests for Production of Documents Number 5 and 6

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Ryan Robert Christen Document Served: Summons and Complaint and Electronic Filing Notice Date Served: 06/02/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Michael A. Larson Document Served: Summons and Complaint and Electronic Filing Notice Date Served: 05/16/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 177233, Payable Number: 257415, Receipt Number: 21R 013500, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Notice of Retainer by Attorney John Manydeeds on behalf of Defendants Michael Larson and Ryan Christen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer and affirmative defense; Additional Text: of Defendant's Larson and Christen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Party To Serve: Managed Health Services Insurance Corporation Document Served: Summons and Complaint Date Served: 05/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 141788, Payable Number: 256392, Receipt Number: 21R 011213, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Manydeeds, John E