This case was last updated from Brown County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 13:52:48 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC vs. Georgetta Cleggett

Case Summary

On 05/18/2021 Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Georgetta Cleggett. This case was filed in Brown County Wisconsin Courts, Brown County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Resar, Chad. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********2113

  • Filing Date:

    05/18/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Brown, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Resar, Chad

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Cleggett, Georgetta

Green Bay, WI 54303-3008

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Olson, Samuel J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/24/2022
  • JudgementJudgement type: Judgment for money; County: BROWN; Case number: 2021SC002113; Caption: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC vs. Georgetta Cleggett; Total Amount: $988.13; Judgment Party; Party Name: Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC; Party type: Creditor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: c/o Messerli & Kramer PA, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250, Plymouth, MN 55441 US; Judgment Party; Party Name: Georgetta Cleggett; Party type: Debtor; Status: Active; Dismissed: No; Address: 110 GRAY ST, Green Bay, WI 54303-3008 US; Costs/Amount; Description: Judgment amount; Amount: $871.63; Costs/Amount; Description: Small claims filing fee; Amount: $114.5; Costs/Amount; Description: Service; Amount: $2.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Reopen; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of entry of judgment; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order for financial disclosure; Court Official: Resar, Chad

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Based on Noncompliance for Money Judgment Non Eviction

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2022
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: The case was dismissed per Stipulation. PL's affidavit and motion does not accurately reflect the court record. If the PL's attorney desires to file a request for judgment based upon failure of DEF to comply with stipulation on file (if any), court will consider

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulation; Additional Text: Stipulated Dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: Resar, Chad; Additional Text: 01:30 PM Attorney Samuel J Olson appeared by video means for Plaintiff Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. Defendant Georgetta Cleggett not in court. Adjourned return date scheduled for July 21, 2021 at 03:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Adjourned return date on July 21, 2021 at 03:15 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Return date on June 9, 2021 at 01:15 pm. Due to the COVID-19 pandemic and the Wisconsin Supreme Courts Order dated March 22, 2020 (amended April 15, 2020 and May 22, 2020) suspending in-person court hearings, THIS HEARING WILL TAKE PLACE BY VIDEO AND TELEPHONE CONFERENCING DO NOT APPEAR IN PERSON. You may join this hearing by video using the following website: https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/98641502081?pwd=TUVFaXoxUUVFTUdLZ1JFZ1FzMS9ZZz09 (Meeting ID: 986 4150 2081/Password: 632409) or you may join this hearing by telephone by calling 1-312-626-6799 (Meeting ID: 986 4150 2081/Password: 632409). Please be advised that there are many cases scheduled on the Courts calendar during this time period so you may be required to remain in a Virtual Waiting Room until your case is called. Please be sure that your device has sufficient battery life for this possibility. This matter will not be adjourned by the court except upon formal motion for good cause or with specific approval of the court upon stipulation by all parties.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint-service by mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $116.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 013761, Payable Number: 323409, Receipt Number: 21R 019021, Amount: $116.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Olson, Samuel J