This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 01/24/2022 at 17:46:05 (UTC).

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC vs. Brandon Smith

Case Summary

On 09/23/2021 Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against Brandon Smith. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0152

  • Filing Date:

    09/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC

C/O Messerli & Kramer Pa, 3033 Campus Drive Suite 250

Plymouth, MN 55441

Defendant

Smith, Brandon

Monroe, WI 53566-2823

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Kachelski, James E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Dismissal Order comments by Judge Faun Marie Phillipson (3022) - Matter was dismissed w/o prejudice at hearing on 11/30; 5-day hold not applicable.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion hearing; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: 09:01 AM Attorney Jillian Walker appeared by video means for Plaintiff Jefferson Capital Systems, LLC. Court dismisses with out prejudice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: declined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default Judgment; Additional Text: declined - dismissed w/o prejudice due to Defendant's bankruptcy

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Motion hearing on November 30, 2021 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit in support of motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Motion

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 004288, Payable Number: 87711, Receipt Number: 21R 006844, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Kachelski, James E