This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 01/23/2022 at 23:05:49 (UTC).

James Savana et al vs. West Bend Mutual Insurance Company et al

Case Summary

On 07/21/2021 James Savana filed a Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury lawsuit against West Bend Mutual Insurance Company. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Pouros, James G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0347

  • Filing Date:

    07/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Other Personal Injury

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Pouros, James G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Savana, James

Hartford, WI 53027

Defendants

West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

Registered Agent, Christopher Zwygart, 1900 S. 18Th Ave.

West Bend, WI 53095

Sumner Street Plaza, LLC

Registered Agent: Russell E. Schroeder, W4136 Raasch Hill Rd.

Horicon, WI 53032

Pekin Insurance Company

Registered Agent: Lance Grady, N14 W23777 Stone Ridge Dr.

Waukesha, WI 53188

Advance Lawn Service Company LLC

Registered Agent: Austin Cordell, 1859 State Road 83

Hartford, WI 53027

Not Yet Classified

Wisconsin Collaborative Insurance Co.

Registered Agent: Kevin Firzgerald, 777 E. Wisconsin Ave.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Xavier Becerra, Dept. of Health and Human Services

U.S. Attorney, 517 E. Wisconsin Ave.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Hamilton School District Plan by its claims administrator Wi

Registered Agent: Kevin Firzgerald, 777 E. Wisconsin Ave.

Milwaukee, WI 53202

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

Heyer, Kathryn Paula

Defendant Attorneys

Matthiesen, Bradley W.

Weiss, Monte

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Rexroat, Christopher Lee

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Telephone scheduling conference; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 2254 (262)335-4341; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on June 3, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Telephone scheduling conference; Court Official: Pouros, James G.; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference scheduled for June 3, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: 12-person, filed by Atty B Matthiesen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2022
  • DocketEvent: Jury fee paid; Amount: $72.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001358, Payable Number: 163167, Receipt Number: 22R 000900, Amount: $72.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2022
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter received from Atty Christopher L Rexroat dated 1/4/2022 re: Request to be Excused from Scheduling Conference. 1-14-2022 EOZ-Court excuses Atty. Rexroat from 1-19-2022 SC.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling data sheet; Additional Text: filed by Atty K. Heyer, for Plaintiff James Savana

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Scheduling data sheet; Additional Text: filed by Atty B Matthiesen, for Defendants, Sumner Street Plaza and West Bend Mutual Insurance Company

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Statement of Position on Behalf of the US Department of Health and Human Services, filed by Atty M. Flaherty

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Telephone scheduling conference on January 19, 2022 at 08:15 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon United States Secretary of the Dept of Health and Human Services on 7/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon Wisconsin Collaborative Insurance Co on 8/2/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $45.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon West Bend Mutual Insurance Co on 7/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $45.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon Advanced Lawn Service Co on 7/26/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon Pekin Insurance Co on 7/27/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Amount: $55.0; Additional Text: of Summons & Complaint upon Sumner Street Plaza on 7/28/2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Jury demand; Additional Text: for a 12 person jury - see Complaint - requested by Atty K Heyer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint; Additional Text: filed by Atty Kathryn P Heyer of Sperling Law Office

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $285.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 116549, Payable Number: 158018, Receipt Number: 21R 015017, Amount: $285.50

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Matthiesen, Bradley W

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Weiss, Monte