This case was last updated from Grant County Wisconsin Courts on 02/06/2022 at 16:15:24 (UTC).

James E Perry et al vs. Michael Thingvold et al

Case Summary

On 08/05/2021 James E Perry filed a Small Claim - Debt Collection lawsuit against Michael Thingvold. This case was filed in Grant County Wisconsin Courts, Grant County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is VanDeHey, Robert P. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0494

  • Filing Date:

    08/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Debt Collection

  • County, State:

    Grant, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

VanDeHey, Robert P

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

Perry, James E

Potosi, WI 53820

Perry, Loretta L

Potosi, WI 53820

Defendants

Thingvold, Michael

Fennimore, WI 53809

Thingvold, Natalie

Potosi, WI 53820

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: NEJ- N Thingvold

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Thingvold, Michael; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Michael Thingvold Current: 1520 13th Street, Apt. 1, Fennimore, WI 53809 United States (Effective: 08-05-2021) Prior: 134 East Street, Potosi, WI 53820 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letter of dismissal

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for dismissal; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Dismissed; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Court trial on October 1, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return date; Court Official: VanDeHey, Robert P.; Court Reporter: White, Kathleen E.; Additional Text: No appearances. Answer filed. Court schedules motion hearing/court trial 10/1/21 @ 1:30 Court trial scheduled for October 1, 2021 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Answer; Additional Text: Answer by Both Defendants

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declaration of nonmilitary service; Additional Text: Michael

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $98.5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less