This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 22:57:06 (UTC).

In the Matter of the Harding Living Trust

Case Summary

On 10/05/2021 In the Matter of the Harding Living Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Phillipson, Faun Marie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0080

  • Filing Date:

    10/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Phillipson, Faun Marie

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Easland, Cheryl M.

Oregon, WI 53575

Harding, Floyd O.

Clever, MO 65631

Interested Party and Trustee

Harding, Lawrence R., Jr.

Juda, WI 53550

Other

Harding Living Trust Dated April 24, 2002

N698 Mill Road

Juda, WI 53550

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Chesebro, Steven T

Henry, Justin W.

Schroeder, Mark Alan

Interested Party, Trustee and Other Attorney

Hazelbaker, Mark B

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Hearing; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Location: 2nd Floor - Branch 1; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2022
  • DocketEvent: Brief; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Reply Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Bond By The Harding Living Trust and Lawrence Harding, Jr., and Lawrence Harding, Jr., Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Court Reporter: Knox, Christine; Additional Text: Hearing on March 1, 2022 at 10:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Brief; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Petitioners' Brief in Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Bond (pages 1-10)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Brief; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Petitioners' Brief in Opposition to Respondents' Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Bond (pages 11-20)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Request for substitution; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Attorney Steven T. Chesebro's Request for Substitution of Attorneys

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Brief; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Brief in Support of Motion to Dismiss and Motion for Bond By the Harding Living Trust and Lawrence Harding, Jr., and Lawrence Harding, Jr., Trustee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Letter dated 10-28-2021 to Judge Phillipson from Attorney Steven T. Chesebro.

    Read MoreRead Less
14 More Docket Entries
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 1

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 2

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 3

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 4

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 5

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit A - 7

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit B

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit C

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie; Additional Text: Exhibit D

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Hazelbaker, Mark B