This case was last updated from Waukesha County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 21:05:15 (UTC).

In the Matter of Karen Bergsrud

Case Summary

On 12/08/2021 In the Matter of Karen Bergsrud was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Waukesha County Courts, Waukesha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Maxwell, Michael P, Nowakowski, Paul and Bailey, Christopher. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0782

  • Filing Date:

    12/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Waukesha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Maxwell, Michael P

Nowakowski, Paul

Bailey, Christopher

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Bergsrud, Robert

Las Vegas, NV 89122

Other

Bergsrud, Karen

Las Vegas, NV 89122

Interested Parties

Hayalian, Lynn

Eagle, WI 53119

Bergsrud, John

Cudahy, WI 53110

Bergsrud, Joseph

Caledonia, WI 53402

Bergsrud, Brianna

Henderson, NV 89011

Bergsrud, Jordan

Las Vegas, NV 89122

Driver, Samantha

Crawfordsville, AR 72327

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Walsh, Peter J.

Other Attorney

Welcenbach, Jeffrey Knight

Interested Party Attorney

Robe, Melissa D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Maxwell, Michael P.; Location: Courtroom C267; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Release of Health Care Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: for Release of Medical Records

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Release of Health Care Powers of Attorney and Related Materials

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Durable Power of attorney for Health Care Decisions

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Maxwell, Michael P.; Court Reporter: Kwasigroch, Lisa A; Additional Text: 10:36 AM Attorney Jeffrey Knight Welcenbach appeared by video means for Other Karen Bergsrud. Attorney Peter J. Walsh appeared by video means for Petitioner Robert Bergsrud. Attorney Melissa Robe appears by video means. Interested Person Lynn Hayalian appeared by video means. Interested Person John Bergsrud appeared by video means. Other Karen Bergsrud not in court. Attorney Walsh gives status update and requests the court set the matter for a hearing on the activation of all healthcare power of attorney for Karen Bergsrud and request for medicial records from Attorney Robe's Client. Attorney Robe gives statements and objects to the request made by attorney Walsh. Attorney Welcenbach gives statements. Attorney Walsh gives statements. The Court orders those power of Attorney's held by attorney Robe to be turned over, as well as the activation documents, medicaid documentation from Nevada for Mrs. Bergsrud. Attorney Robe requests the Court order psychological evaluation on Mr. Bergsrud. Attorney Walsh objects to the request for a psychological evaluation. Attorney Walsh to submit an order for the courts signature. Court sets the matter for a status in 30 days. Status conference scheduled for February 18, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Maxwell, Michael P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Court Official: Maxwell, Michael P.; Court Reporter: Kwasigroch, Lisa A; Additional Text: Status conference on February 18, 2022 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 001735, Payable Number: 455833, Receipt Number: 22R 002095, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to act GAL/Counsel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Bailey, Christopher; Additional Text: Order appointing Atty. Jeffrey Welcenbach as GAL - signed by Commissioner Bailey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Guardian ad Litem

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: and Notice of Hearing on Verified Petition to Review Conduct of Health Care Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Maxwell, Michael P.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order and notice for hearing; Court Official: Nowakowski, Paul; Additional Text: Hearing scheduled for 01/14/2022 at 10:30 a.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Verified Petition to Review Conduct of health Care Agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 045856, Payable Number: 453288, Receipt Number: 21R 050774, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Robe, Melissa D