This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/06/2022 at 13:53:15 (UTC).

In the Matter of Gary Guy Beaupre Family Trust

Case Summary

On 11/16/2021 In the Matter of Gary Guy Beaupre Family Trust was filed as a Probate - Trust lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Muehlbauer, James K and Adjemian, Sarah. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0205

  • Filing Date:

    11/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Trust

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Muehlbauer, James K

Adjemian, Sarah

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Beaupre, Cynthia M.

Kewaskum, WI 53040

Decedent

Beaupre, Gary Guy

Allenton, WI 53002

Not Yet Classified

Beaupre, Gary Dean

Allenton, WI 53002

Beaupre, Pamela R.

Allenton, WI 53002

Beaupre, Deborah K.

Amberg, WI 54102

Beaupre, Sherri A.

Amberg, WI 54102

Modl, James G.

Two Rivers, WI 54241

Beaupre, RoyAlan

Menasha, WI 54952

Beaupre, Meahna

Trustee

Poch, Diana M.

Hampton, MN 55031

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorneys

Hildebrand, Kirsten Louise

Hovestol, Andrew S.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Lippman, Trevor C

Richie, Isaiah M.

Trustee Attorney

Walsh, Peter J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/22/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Status conference; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Location: Justice Center Courtroom 1244 (262)335-4341; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: Counterclaim - cross complaint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL for Beaupre, Meahna; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Additional Text: Attorney Isaiah Richie for minor beneficiary, Meahna Beaupre

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Muehlbauer, James K; Court Reporter: Weninger, Lisa; Additional Text: Clerk: BMS Appearances: Cynthia Beaupre appears in court with Atty Andrew Hovestol, Gary Dean Beaupre appears in court with Atty Trevor Lippman, Diana Poch appears in court with Atty Peter J Walsh, James Modl also appears in court; COURT: Reviews case. Statements by Atty Hovestol. Statements by Atty Lippman. Statements by Atty Walsh. Court holds colloquy with attorneys. COURT: Schedules a Status Conference for Tuesday, February 22, 2022 at 1:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on February 22, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: served: the Authenticated Copy of the Verified Petition for Judicial Proceeding Related to a Trust on Gary Dean Beaupre on November 27, 2021 via personal service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: served: the Verified Petition for Judicial Proceeding Related to a Trust, Exhibit A to the Verified Petition for Judicial Proceeding Related to a Trust, Exhibit B to the Verified Petition for Judicial Proceeding Related to a Trust on Diana Poch, Sherri Beaupre, RoyAlan Beaupre, Pamela Beaupre, James Modl, Meahna Beaupre, and Deborah Beaupre on December 3, 2021 via us mail

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Counterclaim - cross complaint; Additional Text: ANSWER, AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES, AND COUNTERCLAIM TO VERIFIED PETITION FOR JUDICIAL PROCEEDING RELATED TO A TRUST PURSUANT TO WIS. STATS. 701.201(1) AND FOR OTHER RELIEF; Filed 1/10/22 at 4:31 pm

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Peter J Walsh

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on January 11, 2022 at 09:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition for Judicial Proceeding Related to a Trust Pursuant to Wis. Stat. s. 701.0201(1) and for Other Relief

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 192409, Payable Number: 161605, Receipt Number: 21R 022751, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibit A to Petition- Gary Guy Beaupre Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Exhibit B- First Amendment to Gary Guy Beaupre Family Trust

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Walsh, Peter J.