This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/26/2022 at 12:58:30 (UTC).

In the Estate of Tonya L Ziegler

Case Summary

On 12/28/2021 In the Estate of Tonya L Ziegler was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Henke, Sara. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0360

  • Filing Date:

    12/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Henke, Sara

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ziegler, Tonya L

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Not Yet Classified

Kasmiski, Lorraine M

Columbus, WI 53925

Guardian Ad Litem

Ziegler, Christopher

Hortonville, WI 54944

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Henke, Sara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $913.15; Additional Text: Forte LLc for Capital One

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed trust letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Trust letters; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing GAL; Court Official: Henke, Sara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: Dated; 3/15/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: April 5, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Trust letters

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 730676, Payable Number: 312872, Receipt Number: 21R 038389, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: 2 - GAL for minor heirs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed trust letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.