This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 16:57:49 (UTC).

In the Estate of Timothy J Zupancic

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 In the Estate of Timothy J Zupancic was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Reynolds, Terry L.A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0029

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Reynolds, Terry L.A

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Day, Theresa M

New Lisbon, WI 53950

Zupancic, Christopher J

San Francisco, CA 94102

Decedent

Zupancic, Timothy J

New Lisbon, WI 53950

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Johnson, Eric S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $96959.13

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $193.92; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 010090, Payable Number: 129987, Amount: $193.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Mile Bluff Clinic

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Recorded as Document Number 747460.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $622.83; Additional Text: Mile Bluff Medical Center and Clinic, 1050 Division Street, Mauston, WI 53948, 608-847-9771

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 21RP000271

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.; Additional Text: Held no appearances letters to issue.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 039285, Payable Number: 126091, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less