This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 06:42:22 (UTC).

In the Estate of Thomas R. Louis

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Thomas R Louis was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Louis, Michelle

Middleton, WI 53562

Decedent

Louis, Thomas R.

Jefferson, WI 53549

Not Yet Classified

Paul, Tracy

Fruita, CO 81521

Louis, James

Janesville, WI 53548

Suing, Matthew D

Madison, WI 53711

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Suing, Matthew Daniel

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account; Amount: $55734.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: Petition to Dispense Requirement of Filing Fiduciary Income Tax Returns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Proposed Order to Dispense Requirement of Filing Fiduciary Income Tax Returns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Order to Dispense Requirement of Filing Fiduciary Income Tax Returns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver, Consent and Approval-Inventory and Final Account-Michelle Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver, Consent, and Approval-Inventory and Final Account-Tracy Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Amount: $12928.24; Additional Text: Full distribution of share-James Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Michelle Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Tracy Paul

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary Letters issued to Matthew Suing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Suing, Matthew Daniel