This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 01:38:01 (UTC).

In the Estate of Steven Robert Rowley

Case Summary

On 05/24/2021 In the Estate of Steven Robert Rowley was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Vale, Thomas J and Baertschi, Gloria A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0044

  • Filing Date:

    05/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Vale, Thomas J

Baertschi, Gloria A

 

Party Details

Decedent

Rowley, Steven Robert

Brodhead, WI 53520

Not Yet Classified

Rowley, Nicholas S

Brodhead, WI 53520

Rowley, Sarah J

Brodhead, WI 53520

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Knoke, Gregory E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $300507.94

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $601.02; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005442, Payable Number: 88670, Receipt Number: 21R 008355, Amount: $601.02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of overdue inventory; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter dated 08-13-2021 from Lorraine K. Randall, Estate Recovery Specialist Senior

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $6529.33; Additional Text: Dept. of Health Services DMS/Estate Recovery Section PO Box 309 Madison, WI 53701-0309

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Additional Text: Sarah J. Rowley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Additional Text: Nicholas Rowley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J; Additional Text: Sarah Rowley

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order Submitted in PDF Format Declined; Court Official: Vale, Thomas J

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Knoke, Gregory E