This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 09:41:58 (UTC).

In the Estate of Sarah K Schisel

Case Summary

On 08/26/2021 In the Estate of Sarah K Schisel was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Koppa, Patricia, Fruzen, Dawn M and Koppa, Patricia A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0128

  • Filing Date:

    08/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Koppa, Patricia

Fruzen, Dawn M

Koppa, Patricia A

 

Party Details

Decedent

Schisel, Sarah K

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Not Yet Classified

VanderBloomen, Caroline A.

Manitowoc, WI 54220

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Lambert, Michael E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Fruzen, Dawn M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Petition waiving fiduciary income tax return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Koppa, Patricia A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Timothy J. Schisel

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Jennifer L. Seefeldt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Caroline VanderBloomen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
13 More Docket Entries
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 150158, Payable Number: 150167, Receipt Number: 21R 011703, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lambert, Michael E