This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 02:32:17 (UTC).

In the Estate of Roland E. Buchholz

Case Summary

On 05/26/2021 In the Estate of Roland E Buchholz was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Pfitzinger, Brian A and Steger, Lynn M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0117

  • Filing Date:

    05/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Pfitzinger, Brian A

Steger, Lynn M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Moore, Dawn

Oshkosh, WI 54904

Decedent

Buchholz, Roland E.

Waupun, WI 53963

Not Yet Classified

Buchholz, Joyce

Waupun, WI 53963

Buchholz, Paul

Oshkosh, WI 54902

Fletcher, Timothy

Burnett, WI 53922

Interested Parties

Sill, Rebecca

Goose Creek, SC 29445

Buchholz, Patricia

Waupun, WI 53963

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Shanley, Devin C.

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Vande Zande, Daniel L.

Chase, Karla

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $975.0; Additional Text: Lifestar Emergency Medical Servcies, LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for administration; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: Timothy Fletcher

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 06/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: by Atty. Daniel Vande Zande on behalf of Joyce E. Buchholz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order setting time to hear petition; Court Official: Pfitzinger, Brian A.; Additional Text: Hearing on Petition 7/02/2021 at 8:30 a.m. in Br. 1; Final date to file claims 9/13/2021; Publication: Daily Citizen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 051346, Payable Number: 230908, Receipt Number: 21R 009684, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: from 2 of 3 interested persons

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Dawn Moore

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/11/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Vande Zande, Daniel L.

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Chase, Karla