This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 10:53:16 (UTC).

In the Estate of Robert A Holman

Case Summary

On 04/08/2021 In the Estate of Robert A Holman was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0031

  • Filing Date:

    04/08/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Holman, Robert A

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Not Yet Classified

Holman, Mary T

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Holman, Mark

Muskego, WI 53150

Holman, Michael

Sun Prairie, WI 53590

Fargen, Michelle

Sun Prairie, WI 53590

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Ansay, Nicholas Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Full distribution of share to Mary Holman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $160900.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $321.8; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 173751, Payable Number: 184582, Receipt Number: 21R 015515, Amount: $321.80

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 086331, Payable Number: 180998, Receipt Number: 21R 006705, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 10/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Codicil; Additional Text: Codicil dated 05/06/2014

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 10/06/2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Deadline to file claims 07/19/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary Letters issued to Mary Holman

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ansay, Nicholas Joseph