This case was last updated from Washington County Courts on 01/23/2022 at 12:59:20 (UTC).

In the Estate of Ricky L Rusch

Case Summary

On 11/24/2021 In the Estate of Ricky L Rusch was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Adjemian, Sarah, Adjemian, Sarah M and Coykendall, Sherry D. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0214

  • Filing Date:

    11/24/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Adjemian, Sarah

Adjemian, Sarah M

Coykendall, Sherry D

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Kruse, Sherie

West Bend, WI 53095

Decedent

Rusch, Ricky L

West Bend, WI 53095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Hood, Natalie D.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/18/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah M

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $14822.66; Additional Text: Capital One Bank

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22R 000244

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Coykendall, Sherry D; Additional Text: dated: March 25, 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah; Additional Text: Notice waived; bond waived

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah; Additional Text: Issued to Sherie Kruse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Trust letters; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah; Additional Text: Issued to Sherie Kruse for Collin Rusch

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Collin Rusch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Taylor Rusch

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed trust letters

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as trustee; Additional Text: Sherie Kruse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as trustee; Additional Text: Sherie Kruse

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: dated: March 25, 2011

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less