This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 15:19:30 (UTC).

In the Estate of Ralph J. Wiedmeyer

Case Summary

On 09/09/2021 In the Estate of Ralph J Wiedmeyer was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Adjemian, Sarah and Adjemian, Sarah M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0164

  • Filing Date:

    09/09/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Adjemian, Sarah

Adjemian, Sarah M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Wiedmeyer, Ralph J.

West Bend, WI 53095

Not Yet Classified

Wiedmeyer, Timothy

Slinger, WI 53086

Greysen, Wendy

Milwaukee, WI 53207

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Prust, Ian

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah; Additional Text: Notice waived; Bond waived

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah; Additional Text: to Timothy Wiedmeyer and Wendy Greysen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: ORIGINAL Will - dated June 12, 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: David Wiedmeyer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
8 More Docket Entries
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 154032, Payable Number: 159665, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Timothy Wiedmeyer

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Wendy Greysen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: e-filed: dated June 12, 2018

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Timothy Wiedmeyer, Wendy Greysen

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Prust, Ian