This case was last updated from Winnebago County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 07:19:36 (UTC).

In the Estate of Michael E. Schroeder

Case Summary

On 02/12/2021 In the Estate of Michael E Schroeder was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Winnebago County Courts, Winnebago County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Henke, Sara. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0050

  • Filing Date:

    02/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Winnebago, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Henke, Sara

 

Party Details

Decedent

Schroeder, Michael E.

Not Yet Classified

Schroeder, Sharon A.

Oshkosh, WI 54902

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Baivier, Jeanne

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Henke, Sara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Henke, Sara

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver; Additional Text: of Accounting

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Inventory exhibited; Amount: $224634.63

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $449.27; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 338512, Payable Number: 301932, Amount: $449.27

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: Dated: 11/21/1994

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: May 25, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 112345, Payable Number: 295676, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Baivier, Jeanne