This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 06:42:15 (UTC).

In the Estate of Mary L Chaffey

Case Summary

On 03/26/2021 In the Estate of Mary L Chaffey was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0029

  • Filing Date:

    03/26/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Chaffey, Mary L

Sullivan, WI 53178

Not Yet Classified

Chaffey, Michele L

Stockton, CA 95219

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Ansay, Nicholas Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $503654.36; Additional Text: Amended

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $641.2; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 262900, Payable Number: 187628, Receipt Number: 21R 022423, Amount: $641.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $183054.36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $366.11; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 173411, Payable Number: 184313, Receipt Number: 21R 014740, Amount: $366.11

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/06/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 065176, Payable Number: 180668, Receipt Number: 21R 005982, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: Pamela Quest as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary Letters issued to Michele Chaffey

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 10/03/1998

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament filed on 01/06/21 in 21WL02

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ansay, Nicholas Joseph