This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 01/31/2022 at 22:55:34 (UTC).

In the Estate of Luann M Ganser

Case Summary

On 01/21/2021 In the Estate of Luann M Ganser was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hue, William F and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0003

  • Filing Date:

    01/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hue, William F

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Ganser, Luann M

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Not Yet Classified

Ganser, Donna F

Jefferson, WI 53549

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Ansay, Nicholas Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $164578.66

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $329.16; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 131419, Payable Number: 183793, Receipt Number: 21R 013751, Amount: $329.16

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Ganser, Donna F; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Donna F Ganser Current: 405 John Michael Drive, Jefferson, WI 53549 United States (Effective: 07-16-2021) Prior: 405 John Michael Drive, Fort Atkinson, WI 53538 US

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Return of unclaimed/undelivered mail service; Additional Text: Return of RIP mail intended for Donna Ganser. No updated address information - unable to forward. (MBK/02-09-2021)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Deadline to file claims 05/10/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary Letters issued to Donna Ganser

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 021267, Payable Number: 179009, Receipt Number: 21R 001345, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Death certificate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Donna F. Ganser

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2019
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ansay, Nicholas Joseph