This case was last updated from Sauk County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 22:33:38 (UTC).

In the Estate of Lillian C. Peper

Case Summary

On 07/27/2021 In the Estate of Lillian C Peper was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sauk County Courts, Sauk County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Daniels, James. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0101

  • Filing Date:

    07/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sauk, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Daniels, James

 

Party Details

Decedent

Peper, Lillian C.

Loganville, WI 53943

Not Yet Classified

Brown, Jessica C.

Elroy, WI 53929

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/27/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $216.43; Additional Text: 21R 023421

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Jessica Brown to RIP re: filing fee

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $108216.4; Additional Text: Filing fee to be sent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/12/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Johanna Peper - Jessica Brown - Shelley Nelson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Daniels, James; Additional Text: FDFC - 11-12-21 - Rdbg Ind

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Jessica Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Daniels, James; Additional Text: Jessica Brown

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Court Official: Daniels, James

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less