This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 02:02:26 (UTC).

In the Estate of Kimberly K. Hagen

Case Summary

On 05/25/2021 In the Estate of Kimberly K Hagen was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Reynolds, Terry L.A and Smith, Stacy A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0034

  • Filing Date:

    05/25/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Reynolds, Terry L.A

Smith, Stacy A

 

Party Details

Decedent

Hagen, Kimberly K.

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Others and Not Yet Classified

Martens, Bradley L.

Wisconsin Dells, WI 53965

Hagen, Scott A.

Wausau, WI 54401

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Other and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Greenhalgh, William F.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin - Estate Recovery Department - concerns with priority of claims - no notice.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Hearing; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.; Court Reporter: Michalewicz, Mary; Additional Text: The Court calls 21PR34 for hearing. Appearaces Attorney William Greenhalgh on behalf of petition Bradly Martens. Attorney Greenhalgh outlined status of case. Was filed Informal letter discovered assets were under $50,000.00 less debts. Converted from Informal to Summary Assignment. Claims were filed and not contested them. A proposed order has been provided. Scott Hagen residual beneficiary. Paid off loan since not an assets for recovery. Auto provided to him. Court makes findings filed on May 9, 2021; decedent domiciled in Juneau County; Notice was given; Assets under $50.000.00. Court will sign proposed order. Attorney Greenhalgh will distribute assets and file receipts. Nothing further, Court adjourns.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment findings and order; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed summary assignment findings and order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Court Official: Smith, Stacy A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $41332.93; Additional Text: State of Wisconsin Estate Recovery Section - Dept of Health Services, P.O. Box 309, Madison, WI 54701-0309 608-264-7739

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 21RP000278

    Read MoreRead Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 048960, Payable Number: 126447, Receipt Number: 21R 003990, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greenhalgh, William F.