This case was last updated from Washington County Wisconsin Courts on 02/03/2022 at 14:10:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Kari L. Mueller

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 In the Estate of Kari L Mueller was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Washington County Wisconsin Courts, Washington County Circuit Court located in Waupaca, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Adjemian, Sarah and Adjemian, Sarah M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0074

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Washington, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Adjemian, Sarah

Adjemian, Sarah M

 

Party Details

Decedent

Mueller, Kari L.

West Bend, WI 53095

Not Yet Classified

Mueller, Patrick W.

West Bend, WI 53095

Schilling, Michael

West Bend, WI 53095

Interested Parties

Schilling, Olivia K

West Bend, WI 53095

Schilling, Grace L

West Bend, WI 53095

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorneys

Richie, Isaiah M.

Williams, Charles H

Dineen, Daniel R.

Interested Party Attorney

Becker, Jerome M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of overdue inventory; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $235651.1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $471.3; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 210663, Payable Number: 162086, Amount: $471.30

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Daniel R Dineen representing Michael C. Schilling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Adjemian, Sarah M

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $7164.07; Additional Text: Michael Schilling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 135648, Payable Number: 159137, Receipt Number: 21R 017374, Amount: $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $166666.66; Additional Text: Pearse Schilling c/o Michael Schilling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 135649, Payable Number: 159135, Receipt Number: 21R 017372, Amount: $3.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
17 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 059224, Payable Number: 155219, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Patrick Mueller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Patrick Mueller

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Pearce Schilling

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Prop. Order Appointing GAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less