This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/04/2022 at 13:31:53 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joyce R. Krueger

Case Summary

On 06/28/2021 In the Estate of Joyce R Krueger was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0053

  • Filing Date:

    06/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Krueger, Joyce R.

Waterloo, WI 53594

Not Yet Classified

Krueger, Diane C

Madison, WI 53705

Krueger, Douglas

Menomonie, WI 54751

Krueger, Randal

Suamico, WI 54173

Jacobson, Rhoda

Mount Gretna, PA 17064

Krueger, Donald

Cudahy, WI 53110

Schorer, Wayne

Sheboygan Falls, WI 53085

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/20/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/24/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: T.C.: Returning check to Atty - Check with corrected amount to mailed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: Probate claims notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $120312.92

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of overdue inventory; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Probate claims notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Douglas Krueger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Randal Krueger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Rhoda Jacobson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Donald Krueger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Diane Krueger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 08/03/2017

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.