This case was last updated from Kenosha County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 10:04:09 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joy A Nagel

Case Summary

On 08/27/2021 In the Estate of Joy A Nagel was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Kenosha County Courts, Kenosha County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Kerkman, Chad G and Sheffler, Brian. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0182

  • Filing Date:

    08/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Kenosha, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Kerkman, Chad G

Sheffler, Brian

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Administrators

Marinosci Law Group

5225 N Ironwood Rd, Suite121

Milwaukee, WI 53217

Trinkl, Stefanie

Greendale, WI 53129

Not Yet Classified

Eichelberger, Valerie

Antioch, IL 60002

Carlson, Amanda

Trevor, WI 53179

Nagel, Jasmine

Bristol, WI 53104

Nagel, Eddie

Marlow, OK 73055

Nagel, Courtney

Jacksonville, FL 32226

baranek, Valerie

Antioch, IL 60002

Eichelberger aka Valerie Baranek, Valerie

Antioch, IL 60002

Baranek, Amanda

Trevor, WI 53179

Carlson aka Amanda Baranek, Amanda

Trevor, WI 53179

Baranek, Melissa

Sturtevant, WI 53177

Baranek, Crystal

Milwaukee, WI 53220

Decedent

Nagel, Joy A

Bristol, WI 53104

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Schmeling, Sara Marie

Decedent Attorney

Trinkl, Stefanie E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Sheffler, Brian

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G; Additional Text: to Atty Stephanie Trinkl

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for special administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 447828, Payable Number: 327828, Receipt Number: 21R 024208, Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Marinosci Law Group

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: by Stephanie Trinkl as Special Admnistrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of service; Additional Text: of Consent to Serve; Petition for Special Administration; Proof of Heirship; Proposed Order for Special Administration; Proposed Letters of Special Administration on Crystal Baranek, Melissa Baranek, Amanda Carlson aka Amanda Baranek, Valerie Eichelberger aka Valerie Baranek, Courtney Nagel, Eddie Nagel, Jasmine Nagel, Stefanie Trinkl by mail by Sara Schmeling on 08-24-2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued; Court Official: Kerkman, Chad G

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2019
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Schmeling, Sara Marie