This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 16:55:47 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joseph R. Light

Case Summary

On 04/28/2021 In the Estate of Joseph R Light was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Fishbain, Bruce. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0131

  • Filing Date:

    04/28/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Fishbain, Bruce

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Light, June

Milwaukee, WI 53209

Decedent

Light, Joseph R.

Racine, WI 53404

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent, Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Mason, Rebecca Kathryn

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $54130.18

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $108.26; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 869528, Payable Number: 446644, Receipt Number: 21R 012469F, Amount: $108.26

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: June Light - full distribution

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Minutes; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce; Additional Text: Review hearing on September 29, 2021 at 10:40 am. ***Please see above new time*** Bruce Fishbain is inviting you to a scheduled Zoom meeting. Join Zoom Meeting https://wicourts.zoom.us/j/82291962900?pwd=MENZVEFDNU5rRG9id1B1TUFLL3c3dz09 Meeting ID: 822 9196 2900 Passcode: 982211 One tap mobile +13017158592,,82291962900# US (Washington DC) +13126266799,,82291962900# US (Chicago) Dial by your location +1 301 715 8592 US (Washington DC) +1 312 626 6799 US (Chicago) +1 646 558 8656 US (New York) +1 253 215 8782 US (Tacoma) +1 346 248 7799 US (Houston) +1 669 900 9128 US (San Jose) Meeting ID: 822 9196 2900 Find your local number: https://wicourts.zoom.us/u/kTCHKR0rz Join by SIP 82291962900@zoomcrc.com Join by H.323 162.255.37.11 (US West) 162.255.36.11 (US East) 115.114.131.7 (India Mumbai) 115.114.115.7 (India Hyderabad) 213.19.144.110 (Amsterdam Netherlands) 213.244.140.110 (Germany) 103.122.166.55 (Australia Sydney) 103.122.167.55 (Australia Melbourne) 149.137.40.110 (Singapore) 64.211.144.160 (Brazil) 149.137.68.253 (Mexico) 69.174.57.160 (Canada Toronto) 65.39.152.160 (Canada Vancouver) 207.226.132.110 (Japan Tokyo) 149.137.24.110 (Japan Osaka) Meeting ID: 822 9196 2900 Passcode: 982211

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 237249, Payable Number: 431473, Receipt Number: 21R 004283F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order setting time to hear petition; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Fishbain, Bruce

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: signed by June Light

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Mason, Rebecca Kathryn