This case was last updated from Green County Courts on 02/28/2022 at 12:52:53 (UTC).

In the Estate of Joseph E Hughes

Case Summary

On 12/30/2021 In the Estate of Joseph E Hughes was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Green County Courts, Green County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Phillipson, Faun Marie and Baertschi, Gloria A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0105

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Green, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Phillipson, Faun Marie

Baertschi, Gloria A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Maurer-Skatrud, Ann

Monroe, WI 53566

Decedent

Huges, Joseph E

Monroe, WI 53566

Not Yet Classified

St Clare of Assisi Parish

Monroe, WI 53566

Hughes, Maurice J

Oregon, WI 53575

Molitor, Patricia

Sun Prairie, WI 53590

Grunder, Patricia L

Monroe, WI 53566

Maurer, Mary E

Monroe, WI 53566

Milz, Ellen M

Oregon, WI 53575

Hughes, Dennis

Evansville, WI 53536

Hughes, Randal

South Lyon, MI 48178

Jaeggi, Melissa

Milton, WI 53563

Hughes, James

Monroe, WI 53566

Hughes, Jeffrey

Germantown, WI 53022

Hughes, Joel

Madison, WI 53718

Hughes, Jason

Monroe, WI 53566

Elliott, Theresa

Madison, WI 53711

Bregenzer, Marco, Jr

Crystal Lake, IL 60014

Dvorak, Ann

Mendota Heights, MN 55118

Deisinger, Mary

Oregon, WI 53575

Bregenzer, James

Oregon, WI 53575

15 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Petitioner Attorney

Sauer, John C.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/03/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Calendar call; Court Official: Baertschi, Gloria A.; Additional Text: 09:38 AM No appearances. No objection to admission of Will and Domiciliary Letters being issued.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/27/2022
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2022
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 005688, Payable Number: 88889, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims; Court Official: Phillipson, Faun Marie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sauer, John C.