This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/01/2022 at 11:20:56 (UTC).

In the Estate of John Affolter

Case Summary

On 02/23/2021 In the Estate of John Affolter was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nelson, Ericka and Rohan, Rebecca S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0023

  • Filing Date:

    02/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nelson, Ericka

Rohan, Rebecca S

 

Party Details

Decedent

Affolter, John

Wilson, WI 54027

Not Yet Classified

Van Riper, Patricia

Baldwin, WI 54002

Cork, Mary

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Traxler, Gloria

Woodville, WI 54028

Timm, Linda

Wilson, WI 54027

Affolter, Luke

Chandler, AZ 85226

Affolter, Emily

Menomonie, WI 54751

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Skoglund, Tamara M.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Rohan, Rebecca S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: by Register to Atty Skoglund and PR dated 12/20/21 RE: 10 month reminder letter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Rohan, Rebecca S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/28/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $230600.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $461.2; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 054485, Payable Number: 230724, Receipt Number: 21R 009238, Amount: $461.20

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Nelson, Ericka

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Nelson, Ericka; Additional Text: deadline for filing a claim is June 4, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: copy of Will

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Luke Affolter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Linda Timm

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Gloria Traxler

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Emily Affolter

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Patricia Van Riper

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Skoglund, Tamara M.