This case was last updated from Wood County Wisconsin Courts on 02/01/2022 at 10:20:13 (UTC).

In the Estate of JoAnne M Nikolay, a/k/a Joan Marie Nikolay

Case Summary

On 02/19/2021 In the Estate of JoAnne M Nikolay, a/k/a Joan Marie Nikolay was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Wood County Wisconsin Courts, Wood County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Anderson, Mary and Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    02/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Wood, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Anderson, Mary

Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Wunrow, Robert

Auburndale, WI 54412

Decedent

Nikolay, JoAnne M

Marshfield, WI 54449

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition and order waiving closing certificate; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Anderson, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Cover letter from PR Robert Wunrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: from Robert Wunrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Inventory, Estate Account and PR's Statement to Close provided to interested persons (7)

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Agreement between heirs

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Demand for formal proceedings; Additional Text: to waive tax return and Certificate filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Court Official: Brazeau, Nicholas J., Jr.; Additional Text: to Waive Filing of Closing Certificate for Fiduciary Income Tax Return

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Marshfield News Herald; 3/5/21, 3/12/21, and 3/19/21

    Read MoreRead Less
16 More Docket Entries
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Anderson, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Anderson, Mary; Additional Text: Robert Wunrow appointed PR; no bond required

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Anderson, Mary; Additional Text: to Robert Wunrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Anderson, Mary; Additional Text: 06/01/2021 - Last date to file Claims Against Estate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Anderson, Mary

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Additional Text: No surviving spouse; children surviving 6

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: signed by Christelle Hall, Jane Wunrow, Paula Anderson, June Olson, Geralyn A. Wilson, Susan Christensen and Robert Wunrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: signed by Robert Wunrow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less