This case was last updated from Juneau County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 12:12:50 (UTC).

In the Estate of Jewell K Wells

Case Summary

On 04/12/2021 In the Estate of Jewell K Wells was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Juneau County Courts, Juneau County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Reynolds, Terry L.A. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0024

  • Filing Date:

    04/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Juneau, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Reynolds, Terry L.A

 

Party Details

Petitioner

McDade, Angela R

Mauston, WI 53948

Not Yet Classified

Pianpiano, Jessica N

Louisville, TN 37777

Caruana, Joseph E

San Antonio, TX 78259

McDade, Shannon K

Tempe, AZ 85283

McDade, Jessica N

Louisville, TN 37777

Caruana, Elijah

San Antonio, TX 78259

Decedent

Wells, Jewell K

Lookout Mountain, GA 30750

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Johnson, Eric S.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Reynolds, Terry L.A.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's deed; Additional Text: Recorded August 26, 2021 as Document # 746469

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $40000.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $80.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 078235, Payable Number: 127782, Amount: $80.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: Assignment of Interest Joseph to Angela

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: Joseph

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament of Jewell K. Wells dated the 16th day of October, 2006.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/19/2016
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less