This case was last updated from Barron County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 12:30:31 (UTC).

In the Estate of James William Seemann

Case Summary

On 04/13/2021 In the Estate of James William Seemann was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Barron County Courts, Barron County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Alsbury, Deanne and Babler, James C. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0054

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Barron, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Alsbury, Deanne

Babler, James C

 

Party Details

Petitioners and Not Yet Classified

Louis, Jennifer A.

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Seemann, James W., Jr.

Chetek, WI 54728

Race, Jennifer R.

West Des Moines, IA 50265

Decedent

Seemann, James William

Cameron, WI 54822

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Klemish, Vanessa A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition and order waiving closing certificate; Court Official: Babler, James C.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Alsbury, Deanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: by James W. Seemann Jr. for full payment of share

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: by Jennifer A. Louis for full payment of share

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition; Additional Text: for Waiver of Fiduciary Income Tax Returns

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Alsbury, Deanne

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $88400.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $176.8; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 058948, Payable Number: 122720, Receipt Number: 21RP001921, Amount: $176.80

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 025512, Payable Number: 120848, Receipt Number: 21RP000854, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: by Jennifer A. Louis

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: by James W. Seemann, Jr.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: by Jennifer R. Race

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Klemish, Vanessa A