This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 21:28:12 (UTC).

In the Estate of James D. Walker

Case Summary

On 09/29/2021 In the Estate of James D Walker was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Krause, Shannon and Krause, Shannon E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0061

  • Filing Date:

    09/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Krause, Shannon

Krause, Shannon E

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Walker, Carole L.

West Concord, MN 55985

Decedent

Walker, James D.

Kenyon, MN 55946

Interested Party

Walker, Tyler

Kenyon, MN 55946

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Ludeman, Benjamin D

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/30/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/02/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • DocketEvent: Received documents

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/26/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Krause, Shannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: AMENDED with resident agent signature

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: error in deadline date, see second filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002930, Payable Number: 68251, Receipt Number: 21R 005479, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: not signed by resident agent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: signed by TW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: CLW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: TW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Additional Text: resident agent and bond lingo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: resident agent and bond lingo

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2019
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ludeman, Benjamin D