This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/04/2022 at 06:32:55 (UTC).

In the Estate of Heather R Kirby

Case Summary

On 06/07/2021 In the Estate of Heather R Kirby was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Warner, Susan and Schumacher, Michael A. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0084

  • Filing Date:

    06/07/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Warner, Susan

Schumacher, Michael A

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kirby, Heather R

Altoona, WI 54720

Interested Party and Not Yet Classified

Kirby, Harry S

Altoona, WI 54720

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Interested Party and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Poquette, Ronald G

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Schumacher, Michael A; Additional Text: on Affidavit of No Income Tax Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Warner, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: for Inventory and Final Estate Account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $306382.75

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $612.77; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 319252, Payable Number: 261704, Receipt Number: 21R 023679, Amount: $612.77

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Additional Text: Harry Kirby - full

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of No Income Tax Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Order on Affidavit of No Income Tax Liability

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Warner, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
10 More Docket Entries
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Jessica Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Cheryl Kirby Stokes

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Harry Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Austin Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Brandon Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Harry Kirby

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Poquette, Ronald G