This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/06/2022 at 04:02:34 (UTC).

In the Estate of Gladys A Vogel

Case Summary

On 10/21/2021 In the Estate of Gladys A Vogel was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0086

  • Filing Date:

    10/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Vogel, Gladys A

Jefferson, WI 53549

Not Yet Classified

Sukow, Christine J

Jefferson, WI 53549

Gladys A Vogel Revocable Living Trust

811 E Racine St

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Baumgard, Timothy J

Madison, WI 53715

Fort HealthCare

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Ansay, Nicholas Joseph

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 22R 001248

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $2775.32; Additional Text: Fort HealthCare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Domiciliary letters issued to Christine Sukow and Timothy Baumgard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate; Additional Text: Last Will and Testament dated 07/19/2018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 218428, Payable Number: 186418, Receipt Number: 21R 019624, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Christine Sukow and Timothy Baumgard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Consent to Serve-Timothy Baumgard

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Consent to Serve-Christine Sukow

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Ansay, Nicholas Joseph