This case was last updated from Sawyer County Courts on 02/05/2022 at 05:01:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Genevieve Ada Wilkozek

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 In the Estate of Genevieve Ada Wilkozek was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Sawyer County Courts, Sawyer County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Krause, Shannon and Krause, Shannon E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0050

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Sawyer, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Krause, Shannon

Krause, Shannon E

 

Party Details

Decedent

Wilkozek, Genevieve Ada

Hayward, WI 54843

Interested Parties and Not Yet Classified

Wilkozek, Joseph H.

Hayward, WI 54843

Wilkozek, David P.

Hayward, WI 54843

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Interested Party Attorney

Duffy, Thomas J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/12/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Krause, Shannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2021
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Krause, Shannon E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 002455, Payable Number: 67795, Receipt Number: 21R 004522, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: JHW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: JHW and DPW

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Additional Text: 12/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Krause, Shannon

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/21/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Duffy, Thomas J