This case was last updated from Monroe County Wisconsin Courts on 02/05/2022 at 21:42:52 (UTC).

In the Estate of Eunice L Savall

Case Summary

On 09/30/2021 In the Estate of Eunice L Savall was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Monroe County Wisconsin Courts, Monroe County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Berendes, Diane. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0071

  • Filing Date:

    09/30/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Monroe, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Berendes, Diane

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioners

Schwarz, Debra

Cashton, WI 54619

Savall, Ronald

Wilton, WI 54670

Savall, Gary

River Falls, WI 54022

Beier, Linda

Wilton, WI 54670

Savall, Bruce

Sparta, WI 54656

Savall, Robert

Sparta, WI 54656

Savall, Sherri

Wilton, WI 54670

Decedent

Savall, Eunice L

Sparta, WI 54656

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified and Petitioner Attorney

Locante, Shari LePage

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/30/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/23/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: Notice to Creditors published in the Monroe County Herald on November 11, 18, and 22, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: to: Debra Schwarz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Berendes, Diane

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Codicil admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Surety bond posted/signed for Schwarz, Debra; Amount: $140000.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: original Last Will and Testament dated September 28, 1993.

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: final date to file claims: 2/11/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 007685, Payable Number: 165898, Receipt Number: 21RT003955, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Ronald Savall Gary Savall Linda Beier Bruce Savall Robert Savall Debra Schwarz Linda Beier

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Locante, Shari LePage