This case was last updated from Dodge County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 08:15:18 (UTC).

In the Estate of Donald J Gubin Sr

Case Summary

On 11/02/2021 In the Estate of Donald J Gubin Sr was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Dodge County Courts, Dodge County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Steger, Lynn M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0266

  • Filing Date:

    11/02/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Dodge, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Steger, Lynn M

 

Party Details

Interested Parties and Not Yet Classified

Herzberg, Jennifer

Columbus, WI 53925

Statz, Dina T

Juneau, WI 53039

Gubin, LaVerne

Mayville, WI 53050

Statz, Hayden J

Juneau, WI 53039

Rake, Diane

Waunakee, WI 53597

Frederick, Donna

Markesan, WI 53946

Gubin, Dale

Ripon, WI 54971

Grahn, Doreen

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

Hoch, Darcy

West Bend, WI 53095

Hetzberg, Jenny

Columbus, WI 53925

Decedent

Gubin, Donald J, Sr

Juneau, WI 53039

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent, Interested Party and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Gergen, Dawn Pubanz

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/26/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims (NC); Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
7 More Docket Entries
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice interested persons/time limit filing claims; Court Official: Steger, Lynn M.; Additional Text: Heirship Hearing: 12/14/2021 at 9:00 a.m. before Register in Probate Claims Limited to: 2/18/2022 Publication: Daily Citizen

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/03/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 114762, Payable Number: 235969, Receipt Number: 21R 019336, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: from Dina Statz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: by Dina T. Statz

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice interested persons/ filing claims

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gergen, Dawn Pubanz