This case was last updated from Fond Du Lac County Courts on 01/31/2022 at 14:59:55 (UTC).

In the Estate of Dolores M Nichols

Case Summary

On 01/05/2021 In the Estate of Dolores M Nichols was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Fond Du Lac County Courts, Fond Du Lac County Circuit Court located in Taylor, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Woelfel, Brenda L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0007

  • Filing Date:

    01/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Fond du Lac, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Woelfel, Brenda L

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

Nichols, Allan E

Nichols, Randolph C

Nichols, Michael S

Decedent

Nichols, Dolores M

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent and Not Yet Classified Attorney

Liska, Tammy Jo

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Allan E. Nichols

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Estate of Randolph C. Nichols, Lee Carpenter, PR

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.; Additional Text: Michael S. Nichols

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/17/2022
  • DocketEvent: Closing certificate fiduciaries; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/20/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $26.62; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 152213, Payable Number: 255808, Receipt Number: 21R 022981, Amount: $26.62

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $199078.77; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
9 More Docket Entries
  • 01/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 012554, Payable Number: 244725, Receipt Number: 21R 000180, Amount: $20.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued; Court Official: Woelfel, Brenda L.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/27/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less