This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 02/19/2022 at 12:59:10 (UTC).

In the Estate of Bernice M Kuck

Case Summary

On 12/21/2021 In the Estate of Bernice M Kuck was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Kayartz, Julie. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0137

  • Filing Date:

    12/21/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Kayartz, Julie

 

Party Details

Decedent

Kuck, Bernice M

Columbus, WI 53925

Not Yet Classified

Ward, Gerald

River Falls, WI 54022

Kuck, Hilda M

Columbus, WI 53925

Kuck, Lawrence

Madison, WI 53714

Kuck, Ralph

Greenville, SC 29609

Hammon, Karen

Oregon, WI 53575

Kuck, David

Whitewater, WI 53190

Knudson, Janet

Columbus, WI 53925

Lange, Darlene

Shawano, WI 54166

Lange, Dennis

Columbus, WI 53925

Ward, Gene

Wauzeka, WI 53826

Brotzman, Ruby

Tigerton, WI 54486

Kuck, Gary

Lakeville, MN 55044

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Not Yet Classified Attorney

Strohschein, Alan J.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/14/2023
  • HearingDescription: Eighteen month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Inventory due date; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2022
  • HearingDescription: Final date to file claims; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Application for informal probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 010462, Payable Number: 164898, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice to creditors; Additional Text: Claims to be filed on/before: March 29, 2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will admitted to probate

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Domiciliary letters issued; Additional Text: issued to Gerald Ward

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of estate administration deadlines; Court Official: Kayartz, Julie

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will filed; Additional Text: Original - Last Will & Testament of Bernice M. Kuck dated September 18, 2015

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Strohschein, Alan J.