This case was last updated from Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts on 02/06/2022 at 02:12:56 (UTC).

In the Estate of Ashley Sutton

Case Summary

On 10/15/2021 In the Estate of Ashley Sutton was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Jefferson County Wisconsin Courts, Jefferson County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Hue, William F and Weber, Jennifer. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0028

  • Filing Date:

    10/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Jefferson, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Hue, William F

Weber, Jennifer

 

Party Details

Decedent

Sutton, Ashley

Fort Atkinson, WI 53538

Administrator

Sutton, Gina

Janesville, WI 53548

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Administrator Attorney

Sperling, Michael Scott

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/19/2022
  • DocketEvent: Estate receipt; Amount: $239.0; Additional Text: Full satisfaction of claim filed by Fort HealthCare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $239.0; Additional Text: Fort HealthCare

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 21R 022428

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Special administration - petition for discharge

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order discharging special administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order discharging special administrator; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case disposed; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer; Additional Text: Letters of Special Administration issued to Gina Sutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for administration; Court Official: Weber, Jennifer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $40.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 218198, Payable Number: 186268, Receipt Number: 21R 019330, Amount: $40.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: Consent to Serve-Gina Sutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Waiver and Consent-Gina Sutton

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order for administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/15/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/24/2020
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sperling, Michael Scott