This case was last updated from St. Croix County Courts on 02/03/2022 at 14:11:20 (UTC).

In the Estate of Allyn S. Peterson

Case Summary

On 04/19/2021 In the Estate of Allyn S Peterson was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in St. Croix County Courts, St. Croix County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Nelson, Ericka and Rohan, Rebecca S. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0044

  • Filing Date:

    04/19/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    St. Croix, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Nelson, Ericka

Rohan, Rebecca S

 

Party Details

Petitioner and Not Yet Classified

Langer, Michael Ann

Saint Paul, MN 55125

Decedent

Peterson, Allyn S.

Minneapolis, MN 55426

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner, Not Yet Classified and Decedent Attorney

Greske, Amy K.

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/19/2022
  • HearingDescription: Twelve month closing date; Court Official: Rohan, Rebecca S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Personal representative's statement closing estate; Court Official: Rohan, Rebecca S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Final Account and PR Statement to Closed mailed to Michael Langer and Marie Peterson on 9/2/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/02/2021
  • DocketEvent: Final account

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/17/2021
  • DocketEvent: Responsible court official changed; Court Official: Rohan, Rebecca S.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: General inventory filed; Amount: $73200.0

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $146.4; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 053492, Payable Number: 229812, Receipt Number: 21R 007804, Amount: $146.40

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/26/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Inventory

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Request by O'Neill Elder Law Dated 5/6/21 RE: certified copies $10/pd 2 certified copies of domiciliary letters mailed 5/11/21

    Read MoreRead Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: copy eFiled

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve as personal representative; Additional Text: Michael Ann Langer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: Marie A Peterson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed statement of informal administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed domiciliary letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Marie A Peterson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Michael Ann Langer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Greske, Amy K.