This case was last updated from Eau Claire County Courts on 02/06/2022 at 00:42:32 (UTC).

In the Estate of ALICE L SEMINGSON

Case Summary

On 10/11/2021 In the Estate of ALICE L SEMINGSON was filed as a Probate - Other Probate lawsuit. This case was filed in Eau Claire County Courts, Eau Claire County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Warner, Susan. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0160

  • Filing Date:

    10/11/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Probate - Other Probate

  • County, State:

    Eau Claire, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Warner, Susan

 

Party Details

Administrator and Petitioner

SEMINGSON, RICHARD

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Decedent

SEMINGSON, ALICE L

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Not Yet Classified

Semingson, Bruce

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Semingson, John

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Semingson, Jacklyn

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Semingson, Sara

Eau Claire, WI 54703

Semingson, Brian

Eau Claire, WI 54701

Semingson, Luke

Chippewa Falls, WI 54729

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Decedent, Administrator and Petitioner Attorney

Grosskopf, Peter E

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claims fee paid; Amount: $3.0; Additional Text: 21R 025348

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Claim against estate; Amount: $145841.42; Additional Text: Dept. of Health Services, DMS/Estate Recovery Section

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $53.56; Additional Text: 21R 024878

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order appointing special administrator; Court Official: Warner, Susan

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Special administration letters issued; Court Official: Warner, Susan; Additional Text: Issued to: Richard Semingson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of summary procedures deadline; Court Official: Warner, Susan; Additional Text: Review on October 18, 2022 at 12:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed order appointing special administrator

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed special administration letters issued

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summary assignment notice to creditors

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for summary assignment; Additional Text: w/Special Administration

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 319333, Payable Number: 261801, Receipt Number: 21R 023905, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of heirship

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Will; Additional Text: COPY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Waiver and consent; Additional Text: Bruce Semingson, Richard Semingson, John Semingson, Jacklyn Semingson, Sara Semingson, Brian Semingson, and Luke Semingson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Declination to act; Additional Text: by Bruce Semingson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Consent to serve; Additional Text: as special administrator - Richard Semingson

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/11/2021
  • DocketEvent: Change of class code; Additional Text: WCIS Class Code changed from 50101 (Formal Proceedings) to 50105 (Summary Assignment).

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/21/2016
  • DocketEvent: Date of death

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Grosskopf, Peter E