This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 01/22/2022 at 01:31:07 (UTC).

In Re: the Name Change of Elijah Demetrius Jones

Case Summary

On 02/16/2021 In Re the Name Change of Elijah Demetrius Jones was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Hepler, Todd J. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0030

  • Filing Date:

    02/16/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Hepler, Todd J

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Paque, Joy M

Lodi, WI 53555

Interested Party

Jones, Demetrius

Merced, CA 95348

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Lorenz, Geoffrey J

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Receipt; Amount: $2.5; Additional Text: 21R 007101

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: Copy of Order forwarded to the Register of Deeds. Report of Legal Name Change forwarded to Vital Stats

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/22/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Joy Paque re fees

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: of Attempted Service on Non-Petitioning Parent

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Name change hearing; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.; Court Reporter: Hughes, Tiffany; Additional Text: 01:32 PM - ZOOM - Case called - Attorney Geoffrey J Lorenz appeared by video for Petitioner Joy M Paque. Petitioner Joy M Paque appeared by video. Statement by Atty. Lorenz. Court - Court granted name change Recess @ 1:36

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Video conferencing; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for name change; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.; Additional Text: - name changed to Elijah Kurt Paque

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition granted; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of publication; Additional Text: - Merced Sun Star, County of Merced, State of California

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for name change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of non-service; Additional Text: for Demetrius K. Jones

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: from Atty. Geoffrey Lorenz requesting permission for Notice by Publication for Demetrius Jones APPROVED.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/10/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order Declined

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Name Change Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice and order for name change hearing; Court Official: Hepler, Todd J.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for name change minor under 14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $184.5; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 21A 001159, Payable Number: 156459, Receipt Number: 21R 001940, Amount: $184.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: for Name Change Hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Lorenz, Geoffrey J