This case was last updated from Manitowoc County Courts on 01/22/2022 at 13:53:13 (UTC).

In Re: the Name Change of Antoinette Marie Gamez

Case Summary

On 03/29/2021 In Re the Name Change of Antoinette Marie Gamez was filed as an Other - Name Change lawsuit. This case was filed in Manitowoc County Courts, Manitowoc County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judge overseeing this case is Dewane, Robert. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0126

  • Filing Date:

    03/29/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • County, State:

    Manitowoc, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judge

Dewane, Robert

 

Party Details

Petitioners

Gamez, Antoinette Marie

Two Rivers, WI 54241

Corando, Antoinette Marie

Two Rivers, WI 54241

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Check/Disbursement; Amount: $30.0; Additional Text: to Register of Deeds Office for Recording Fee.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proof of publication; Additional Text: of Notice and Order For Name Change Hearing published in the Herald Times Reporter for three successive weeks.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Name change hearing; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Court Reporter: Kostichka, Julie; Additional Text: 03:21 PM Petitioner, Antoinette Marie Gamez, in court. Antoinette Marie Gamez has petitioned the Court to change her name from Antoinette Marie Gamez to Antoinette Marie Corando. Petitioner is sworn and testifies. Proof of publication has been filed. No one in the Courtroom objects. Court grants the petition and signs the Order. Antoinette Marie Gamez is now know as Anoinette Marie Corando. Adj. 3:23 p.m.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order for name change; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Additional Text: Granted.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other; Court Official: Dewane, Robert

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Order; Additional Text: Notice and Order for Name Change Hearing.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order for name change

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: to Petitioner, from ARH, re: with documents and instructions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice and order for name change hearing; Court Official: Dewane, Robert; Additional Text: Scheduled for 05/25/2021, at 3:15 p.m., in Br. 3.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/07/2021
  • DocketEvent: Other papers; Additional Text: National Sex Offender Search

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2021
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition for name change adult/minor 14 or older; Additional Text: From Antoinette Marie Gamez to Antoinette Marie Coronado.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/29/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $164.5; Additional Text: 21R 004270

    Read MoreRead Less