This case was last updated from Racine County Courts on 01/29/2022 at 04:29:45 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Thomas R Pranger III and Amanda D Pranger

Case Summary

On 10/06/2021 In RE the marriage of Thomas R Pranger III and Amanda D Pranger was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Racine County Courts, Racine County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Herrera, Georgia L and Cafferty, Kristin M. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0827

  • Filing Date:

    10/06/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Racine, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Herrera, Georgia L

Cafferty, Kristin M

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Pranger III, Thomas R

Kansasville, WI 53139

Respondent

Pranger, Amanda D

Antioch, IL 60002

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Idrizi, Fadil K

Respondent Attorney

Gruhn, Daniel A

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/06/2022
  • HearingDescription: Scheduling conference; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.; Location: Racine County Courthouse - 1st Floor Courtroom; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Petitioner; Additional Text: Thomas Pranger - Preliminary filed by Atty Idrizi

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: First hearing - FCC; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.; Additional Text: Both parties appear. BTC: Temporary Order set. Emailed to CSS Financial w/CPA.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Herrera, Georgia L.; Additional Text: w/minor child

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/11/2022
  • DocketEvent: Change of address notification for Pranger, Amanda D; Additional Text: ADDRESS INFO for Amanda D Pranger Current: 41759 N Dot Place, Antioch, IL 60002 United States (Effective: 01-11-2022) Prior: 1113 S Beaumont Ave, Kansasville, WI 53139 United States

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Response and counterclaim; Additional Text: filed by Atty Gruhn

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/10/2022
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: Wife

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000552, Payable Number: 447638, Receipt Number: 22R 000287F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/07/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Gruhn for RE, Amanda Pranger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/05/2022
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Affidavit of Service for Amanda Pranger on 10/15/21

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Case Converted to Electronic Filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Filing Notice

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: eFiled Document Fee Paid; Amount: $20.0; Additional Text: Adjustment Number: 22A 000051, Payable Number: 447113, Receipt Number: 22R 000065F, Amount: $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Electronic Notice Update

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of retainer; Additional Text: Atty Idrizi for Thomas Pranger

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition with Minor Children; Additional Text: DOM 02/14/14

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons/petition w/ child support or maint request; Additional Text: 21R 009877F

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause for temporary order; Court Official: Cafferty, Kristin M.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit for temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Gruhn, Daniel A