This case was last updated from Rock County Courts on 01/28/2022 at 10:01:56 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Teresa Smith and Guy Alexander Smith

Case Summary

On 08/12/2021 In RE the marriage of Teresa Smith and Guy Alexander Smith was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Rock County Courts, Rock County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Timmerman, Jodi, Meyer, Stephen D, Kuglitsch, Jeffrey S and Dillon, Daniel T. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0484

  • Filing Date:

    08/12/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Rock, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Timmerman, Jodi

Meyer, Stephen D

Kuglitsch, Jeffrey S

Dillon, Daniel T

 

Party Details

Petitioner

Smith, Teresa

Milton, WI 53563

Respondent

Smith, Guy Alexander

Beloit, WI 53511

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Petitioner Attorney

Sayles, William Keith

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/22/2022
  • HearingDescription: Pre-trial conference; Court Official: Dillon, Daniel T.; Location: Video Conference/Zoom Branch 4; Type: Court

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/18/2022
  • DocketEvent: Order; Court Official: Dillon, Daniel T.; Additional Text: Order for Pre-Trial Conference on February 22, 2022 via zoom

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2022
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Pre-trial conference on February 22, 2022 at 01:30 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Letter from Guy Smith to Attorney Sayles regarding Jeep and Trailer

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Letters/correspondence; Additional Text: Attorney Sayles letter to court requesting a final divorce hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Received documents; Additional Text: Cover letter filing proposed order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. temporary order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order; Court Official: Timmerman, Jodi; Additional Text: Hearing held on October 19, 2021 Regarding initial orders

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial Disclosure - Respondent; Additional Text: Respondent Guy Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/19/2021
  • DocketEvent: Temporary order hearing; Court Official: Meyer, Stephen D.; Additional Text: 02:35 PM Court conducted by Zoom. Attorney William Keith Sayles appeared by video means for Petitioner Teresa Smith. Respondent Guy Alexander Smith appeared by video means. Petitioner Teresa Smith appeared by video means. Court addresses the parties regarding possible conflict, all parties waive the conflict. Court orders Guy Smith to file Financial Disclosure by November 1, 2021. Court orders on a temporary basis that each party will have exclusive use of their current residence. Any debt incurred from this date forward shall be sole responsibility of the party. Court orders each party shall be provide their own health insurance going forward. Court orders each party shall pay their own chiropractor bill. Court orders Guy Smith to pay $250.00 toward the Utility bills by October 30, 2021 or pay resulting late fees and penalties. Tracy Smith will have exclusive use of the Chevrolet Sonic. After providing proof of insurance Guy Smith will have exclusive use of the 2008 Jeep Patriot and the Kimko Agility and trailer. Court orders clothing for Guy Smith and the child will be exchanged. Court orders no change to any life insurance policies. De novo rights given. Attorney Sayles will draft the temporary order.

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notes; Additional Text: CONFLICT CASE FOR COMMISSIONER KOLPIEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Order to show cause; Court Official: Timmerman, Jodi; Additional Text: Petitioner Teresa Smith

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Temporary order hearing on October 19, 2021 at 02:30 pm. Zoom instructions.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of mailing; Additional Text: Document(s): Order to Show with Affidavit for Temporary Order, Notice of Hearing with Zoom Information mailed to Respondent Guy Smith on September 24, 2021.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. order to show cause

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/16/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit; Additional Text: Petitioner Teresa Smith's Affidavit to Show Cause and Request for Hearing for Temporary Order

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Affidavit of service; Additional Text: Document(s): Summons and Petition was served to Respondent Guy Smith on August 26, 2021

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Summons and Petition without Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Case initiated by electronic filing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/12/2021
  • DocketEvent: Petition and order for waiver of fees; Court Official: Kuglitsch, Jeffrey S.

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer Sayles, William Keith