This case was last updated from Columbia County Wisconsin Courts on 01/27/2022 at 07:48:48 (UTC).

In RE the marriage of Teresa DeJager and Steven DeJager

Case Summary

On 05/27/2021 In RE the marriage of Teresa DeJager and Steven DeJager was filed as a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit. This case was filed in Columbia County Wisconsin Courts, Columbia County Circuit Court located in Fond du Lac, Wisconsin. The Judges overseeing this case are Von Hoff, Andrea E and Cross, Troy D. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ********0102

  • Filing Date:

    05/27/2021

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • County, State:

    Columbia, Wisconsin

Judge Details

Judges

Von Hoff, Andrea E

Cross, Troy D

 

Party Details

Not Yet Classified

DeJager, Teresa

Beaver Dam, WI 53916

DeJager, Steven

Friesland, WI 53935

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Certificate of service; Additional Text: handed to parties

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/05/2021
  • DocketEvent: Original certificate of divorce or annulment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Stipulated Divorce Hearing; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Court Reporter: Digital Audio Recorder; Additional Text: 3:00 PM Joint Petitioner Teresa DeJager appeared in court pro se. Joint Petitioner Steven DeJager appeared in court pro se. Joint Petitioner - Wife sworn, testified marriage was irretrievably broken, financial information was acceptable, waived maintenance, agreement was fair. Wife did not reserve the right to use former surname. Joint Petitioner - Husband sworn, testified marriage was irretrievably broken, financial information was acceptable, waived maintenance, agreement was fair. Judgment of divorce was granted, based on testimony; Marital Settlement Agreement as amended on the record and Parenting Plan are incorporated into the Judgment; Court advised parties of 6 month waiting period. Divorce effective October 4, 2021 recess @ 3:10.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Findings of facts/conclusions of law w/ judgment; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2021
  • DocketEvent: Default judgment; Court Official: Cross, Troy D.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Stipulated Divorce Hearing on October 4, 2021 at 03:00 pm.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2021
  • DocketEvent: Status conference; Court Official: Von Hoff, Andrea E; Additional Text: ready to set for final hearing

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • DocketEvent: Notice of hearing; Additional Text: Status conference on September 21, 2021 at 11:00 am.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/24/2021
  • DocketEvent: Prop. findings of fact/conclusion of law/judgment

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/23/2021
  • DocketEvent: Party app finding of fact/conclusion of law/jdgmnt

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Steven DeJager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Financial disclosure statement; Additional Text: Teresa DeJager

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 08/06/2021
  • DocketEvent: Marital settlement agreement

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Filing fee paid; Amount: $194.5; Additional Text: 21R 007735

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Joint Petition with Minor Children

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Confidential petition addendum

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: Proposed Parenting Plan - Joint

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/27/2021
  • DocketEvent: File Retained Electronically

    Read MoreRead Less